U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00302
  • Case Name: Gable v. Blade et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Letter]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Letter]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [USCA Order]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Receipt]
  • October 17, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order]
  • October 17, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 17, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 04, 2016: [Request]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • July 13, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 13, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 13, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.