U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00304
  • Case Name: Seaman v. Empire Airlines, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 01, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
  • August 05, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 01, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • August 01, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 15, 2019: [Supplement]
  • July 15, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order]
  • June 21, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • December 22, 2018: [Stipulation]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order]
  • November 29, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 29, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order]
  • November 19, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Quash]
September, 2017
  • September 24, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 17, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • May 17, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 21, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • September 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 18, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 18, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 29, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 29, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 29, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • July 13, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.