U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00316
  • Case Name: Yellowstone Poky, LLC. v. First Pocatello Associates, L.P.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 21, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • April 06, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [USCA Memorandum]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 02, 2019: [Transcript]
  • April 01, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Appeal Transcript Request]
  • March 14, 2019: [Objection to Bill of Costs]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • March 12, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order]
  • March 11, 2019: [Transcript Request]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 26, 2019: [Transcript]
  • February 25, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 19, 2019: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 08, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
  • January 18, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment]
  • January 11, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 11, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Certify]
  • January 04, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 26, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 05, 2018: [Entry of Judgment]
  • December 05, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2018: [Certify]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 16, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 02, 2018: [Reconsideration]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 19, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2018: [Strike]
  • June 12, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 05, 2018: [Strike]
  • June 01, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 01, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • June 01, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 15, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2018: [Protective Order]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 31, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Order of Recusal]
  • November 01, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 01, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • October 11, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 10, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 06, 2017: [Vacate]
  • October 05, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 21, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 20, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • September 08, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 06, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 31, 2017: [Strike]
  • August 23, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order]
  • August 23, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 23, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 23, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Discovery]
  • July 27, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • May 12, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 11, 2017: [Strike]
  • May 10, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 26, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 05, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 05, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • April 05, 2017: [Strike]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 22, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 02, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 02, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 23, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 09, 2016: [Declaration]
  • November 07, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order Staying Case]
  • November 07, 2016: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • November 03, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 24, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 24, 2016: [Supplement]
  • October 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 19, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 19, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 19, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • September 14, 2016: [Intervene]
  • September 14, 2016: [Joinder]
  • September 14, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 06, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • September 06, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 30, 2016: [Strike]
  • August 30, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 23, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 17, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • August 16, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 16, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 29, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 28, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 19, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 14, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 14, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 14, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • July 13, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 13, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.