U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00315
  • Case Name: Yellowstone Poky, LLC et al v. First Pocatello Associates, L.P. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 16, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 14, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 06, 2016: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • September 06, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 06, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 29, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • August 29, 2016: [Relief]
  • August 23, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 28, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order]
  • July 14, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 14, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 14, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 14, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • July 13, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 13, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.