U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00317
  • Case Name: Lawhon v. Blackfoot School District No. 55
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 09, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 27, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 04, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 19, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Order]
  • July 20, 2017: [Stipulation]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Compel]
  • June 30, 2017: [Supplement]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [ADR Plan]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 28, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 12, 2016: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 10, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • July 13, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.