U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00319
  • Case Name: Jones v. Blue Cross of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 12, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Order]
  • October 24, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 24, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 21, 2016: [Stipulation]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • August 29, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 29, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 27, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 01, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Order]
  • July 21, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 19, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • July 18, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.