U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00322
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 12, 2016: [Status Report]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 30, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order]
  • November 21, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 14, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • November 10, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Order]
  • October 26, 2016: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 25, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 17, 2016: [Answer to Petition to Enforce IRS Summons]
  • October 17, 2016: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • October 17, 2016: [Dismiss]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order to Show Cause]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Petition to Enforce IRS Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.