U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00318
  • Case Name: Eisenberg et al v. Idaho Property Management Service Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 17, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 07, 2018: [Status Report]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Status Report]
  • October 24, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • September 18, 2017: [Vacate]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 25, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 24, 2017: [Stay]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Stipulation]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 14, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 07, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 06, 2016: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 10, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.