U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00320
  • Case Name: Crawford v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [USCA Order]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • December 14, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 14, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Response to Habeas Petition]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 18, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 18, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 14, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2017: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 12, 2017: [Disqualify Judge]
  • June 12, 2017: [Stay]
  • June 12, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 20, 2017: [Seal]
  • April 20, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • April 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 11, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • April 11, 2017: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • April 04, 2017: [Stay]
  • April 04, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Order]
  • October 20, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Receipt]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • July 19, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.