U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00197
  • Case Name: Baker v. Corizon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Order]
  • May 16, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • May 15, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 15, 2017: [Stipulation]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 19, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order]
  • July 29, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 29, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 29, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 29, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 28, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 19, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.