U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00323
  • Case Name: Soelberg et al v. McCallister
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [USCA Order]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 13, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 14, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 14, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 14, 2016: [Appellants Reply Brief]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Appellees Brief]
  • November 29, 2016: [Errata]
  • November 08, 2016: [Certificate of Readiness]
  • November 08, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 07, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 07, 2016: [Certificate of Readiness]
  • November 03, 2016: [Excerpt of Record]
  • November 01, 2016: [Excerpt of Record]
  • November 01, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Appellants Brief]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Designations of Record]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Order]
  • July 21, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 20, 2016: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.