U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00325
  • Case Name: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation v. Idaho Hyperbarics, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 04, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Statement]
  • February 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 22, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • September 22, 2017: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 14, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 22, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • August 15, 2017: [Extension of Time to Amend]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • June 09, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • June 08, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 08, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2017: [Entry of Default]
  • June 05, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 01, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 13, 2017: [Stipulation]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 31, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 31, 2016: [Alter Judgment]
  • October 17, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 06, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 06, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • September 14, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 08, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • August 25, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 18, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 05, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 01, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • July 21, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.