U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00324
  • Case Name: McManigal v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 29, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • December 14, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • October 17, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 21, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • July 21, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • July 21, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.