U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00327
  • Case Name: Chitwood v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Order]
  • October 19, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 14, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • October 07, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Order]
  • September 12, 2016: [Stipulation]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 04, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 03, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 26, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • July 25, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order]
  • July 25, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 25, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • July 21, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.