U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00326
  • Case Name: Piland v. State of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Dismiss]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Request]
  • February 21, 2017: [Receipt]
  • February 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • January 17, 2017: [Return Mail]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • December 15, 2016: [Errata]
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order]
  • December 08, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • July 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 21, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • July 21, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • July 21, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 21, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.