U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00331
  • Case Name: Artemenko v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • April 02, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • April 02, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 07, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • February 05, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 05, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 26, 2017: [Order]
  • December 26, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 21, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • December 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
  • December 07, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of Letter of Dismissal]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • July 26, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 22, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • July 22, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.