U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00330
  • Case Name: Whaley v. Bank of America, N.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 18, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 23, 2016: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 13, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 26, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • July 25, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • July 22, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 22, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.