U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cv-00465
  • Case Name: Ciccone v. Ellis et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • June 13, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 10, 2017: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order Reopening Case]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 25, 2016: [Reopen Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.