U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00337
  • Case Name: Petso et al v. Continuity Partners Group, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 08, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Status Report]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Status Report]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 26, 2017: [Order]
  • July 26, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 20, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 11, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 19, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • May 18, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2017: [Stay]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 05, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 10, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Strike]
  • October 24, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 24, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 30, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 30, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • September 30, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order]
  • September 19, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 02, 2016: [Summons Issued]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 26, 2016: [Errata]
  • July 25, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 25, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.