U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00334
  • Case Name: Clyne v. Peck et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2016: [Request]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • September 07, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • July 26, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • July 26, 2016: [Complaint]
  • July 26, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • July 26, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.