U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00333
  • Case Name: Banks v. Disney et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [USCA Order]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Return Mail]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [USCA Order]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 17, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 08, 2017: [Reconsideration]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 17, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • July 26, 2016: [Writ of Mandamus]
  • July 26, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.