U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00329
  • Case Name: Jones et al v. Idaho Legislative Representatives et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 11, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 11, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order]
  • December 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 06, 2017: [Declaration]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2017: [Letter]
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 19, 2017: [Order]
  • September 19, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 19, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • June 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 07, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 02, 2017: [Hearing]
  • June 01, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Seal]
  • May 31, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • May 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 16, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 10, 2017: [Supplement]
  • May 09, 2017: [Supplement]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Temporary Restraining Order]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 08, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 25, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 23, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 05, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Stay]
  • November 25, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 23, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 17, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [Errata]
  • November 14, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 14, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 10, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 09, 2016: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • November 09, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 08, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 08, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 08, 2016: [Dismiss]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2016: [Summons Reissued]
  • October 19, 2016: [Summons Issued]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • July 26, 2016: [Receipt]
  • July 26, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.