U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00341
  • Case Name: LeBlanc v. Twin Falls County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 19, 2016: [Extension of Time to Amend]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order]
  • November 03, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 03, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 11, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • August 09, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • August 09, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • August 03, 2016: [Seal Document]
  • August 03, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 28, 2016: [Supplement]
  • July 28, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • July 28, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 27, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 27, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 27, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.