U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00343
  • Case Name: Hillen v. US Bank, NA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Reference]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 29, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 28, 2016: [Withdraw Reference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.