U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00344
  • Case Name: Davis v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 05, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order]
  • June 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2017: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order]
  • June 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 23, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 30, 2016: [Order]
  • December 30, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order]
  • November 25, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 25, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 22, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 29, 2016: [Receipt]
  • July 29, 2016: [Order]
  • July 29, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 29, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 29, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 28, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.