U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00349
  • Case Name: Sanders v. Idaho Department of Correction et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Letter]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Letter]
  • October 18, 2016: [Receipt]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • August 03, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 03, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 03, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 03, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.