U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00350
  • Case Name: Hayes v. State of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [USCA Order]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 02, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Request]
  • August 24, 2016: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 17, 2016: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • August 17, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 17, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 03, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 03, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.