U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00348
  • Case Name: Edison v. Payette County Jail et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 13, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 17, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 03, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • August 03, 2016: [Complaint]
  • August 03, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 03, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.