U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00351
  • Case Name: Conerly v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [USCA Order]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [USCA Order]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 11, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Alter Judgment]
  • December 13, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Supplement]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 24, 2016: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • August 18, 2016: [Hearing]
  • August 18, 2016: [Declaratory Judgment]
  • August 18, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 04, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 04, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 04, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • August 04, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 04, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.