U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00354
  • Case Name: Scheline et al v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • October 10, 2017: [Declaration]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 10, 2017: [Consent Filed]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Dismiss]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 21, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 16, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 09, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • August 05, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.