U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00355
  • Case Name: Murray v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 30, 2018: [Judgment]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Response (generic)]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Declaration]
  • March 22, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2017
  • February 20, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 05, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • December 07, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • November 21, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • October 20, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 20, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 08, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 08, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • August 07, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • August 07, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.