U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00356
  • Case Name: McCall v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • February 06, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • December 07, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • October 04, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 01, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 09, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 09, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • August 08, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 08, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • August 08, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.