U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00352
  • Case Name: State of Idaho v. Hayes
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [USCA Order]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • August 29, 2016: [Request]
  • August 29, 2016: [Hearing]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 23, 2016: [Disqualify Judge]
  • August 18, 2016: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • August 16, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 08, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 08, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.