U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00353
  • Case Name: Douglas v. American Financial Resources, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • June 12, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 05, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 15, 2017: [Response to Objection to R&R]
  • May 11, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order]
  • May 03, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 02, 2017: [Stipulation]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 20, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 12, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 26, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 26, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • September 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 13, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order]
  • September 12, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 09, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 07, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order]
  • August 19, 2016: [Declaration]
  • August 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 19, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 08, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.