U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00357
  • Case Name: Rodriguez v. Mitchell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 15, 2017: [Dismiss]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Order]
  • October 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 24, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • October 13, 2017: [Seal Document]
  • October 13, 2017: [Declaration]
  • October 13, 2017: [Settlement]
  • October 05, 2017: [Declaration]
  • October 05, 2017: [Hearing]
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2017
  • September 01, 2017: [Status Report]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 22, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 22, 2017: [Status Conference]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Order]
  • July 05, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 13, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 01, 2017: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Report of Mediation]
  • March 01, 2017: [Status Conference]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 14, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 09, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 09, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 09, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Order]
  • October 21, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 11, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 26, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 26, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 23, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 21, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 06, 2016: [Status Report]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 09, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 08, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 08, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.