U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00359
  • Case Name: West v. City of Caldwell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Letter]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Costs Taxed]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • October 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 02, 2019: [Status Report]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 04, 2019: [USCA Order]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [USCA Order]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Retain]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 02, 2018: [Strike]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 18, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 16, 2018: [Transcript Request]
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 15, 2018: [Appeal Transcript]
  • May 08, 2018: [Retain]
  • May 08, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2018: [Stay]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2018: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • April 24, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 24, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • April 18, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order]
  • March 28, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 28, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 11, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 14, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 14, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 05, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Errata]
  • May 22, 2017: [Strike]
  • May 22, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Order]
  • April 25, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • April 10, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2017: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 14, 2017: [In Limine]
  • March 01, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 01, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 20, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 06, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 24, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • October 11, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 11, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 06, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • October 05, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 22, 2016: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 07, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • September 01, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 09, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.