U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00361
  • Case Name: Sargent et al v. American Family Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 14, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • May 08, 2017: [Stipulation]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 30, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order]
  • January 18, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 16, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • August 15, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 15, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • August 10, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.