U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00360
  • Case Name: Sanders v. District Court of the Sixth Judicial District of the State of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • October 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • July 10, 2018: [Return Mail]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 05, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Request]
  • August 18, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • August 10, 2016: [Receipt]
  • August 10, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 10, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 10, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.