U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00363
  • Case Name: Clyne v. Greenwood et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order]
  • May 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order Reopening Case]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Return Mail]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Supplement]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Supplement]
  • October 12, 2016: [Request]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 23, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • August 23, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 11, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.