U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00364
  • Case Name: Kemper et al v. High Range Aviation, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • November 22, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 17, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 10, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Consent Filed]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 02, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order]
  • August 12, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • August 12, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.