U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00365
  • Case Name: Horvath v. The City of Ponderay, Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order]
  • January 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 01, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 12, 2016: [Complaint]
  • August 12, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.