U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00368
  • Case Name: White v. Boise City Taxi, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • December 18, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Order]
  • November 03, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 18, 2017: [Stipulation]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 29, 2017: [Statement]
  • August 25, 2017: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • August 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 07, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 17, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 16, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 07, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 06, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Order]
  • September 13, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order]
  • August 26, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 15, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • August 12, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.