U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00366
  • Case Name: Coeur d'Alene Tribe v. Hawks et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 26, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 09, 2019: [USCA Order]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 21, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 20, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 25, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 28, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 14, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 01, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order]
  • October 17, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 13, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • September 13, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • September 01, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 15, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • August 12, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.