U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00369
  • Case Name: Sabic v. Sergeant et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order]
  • March 30, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 29, 2018: [Stipulation]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 20, 2018: [Stipulation]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 15, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 15, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Order]
  • October 24, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 24, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 19, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 12, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Order]
  • September 13, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 16, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 16, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • August 15, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.