U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00371
  • Case Name: Cruz-Rodriguez v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 01, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 01, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 27, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 24, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • August 17, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.