U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00374
  • Case Name: Paradise Ridge Defense Coalition, Inc. v. Hartman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [USCA Memorandum]
  • December 06, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 23, 2017: [Appeal Transcript Request]
  • October 18, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 21, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Strike]
  • June 23, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 07, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 12, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 12, 2017: [Strike]
  • May 11, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 17, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order]
  • February 27, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 17, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • February 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 26, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 10, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 09, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 13, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 01, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 01, 2016: [Stipulation]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order]
  • November 09, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 25, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • October 25, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 19, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 16, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 15, 2016: [Status Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • August 26, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 26, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 18, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 18, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.