U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00367
  • Case Name: Minton et al v. The State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • November 28, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 18, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 18, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 18, 2016: [Complaint]
  • August 18, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.