U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00375
  • Case Name: Sittre v. Bannock County 6th District Court et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Response (generic)]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 17, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order]
  • October 17, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 13, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • September 27, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 15, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • September 15, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 15, 2016: [Consent Filed]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 25, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 25, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 18, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 18, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.