U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00373
  • Case Name: Matthews v. Price
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 13, 2017: [Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Return Mail]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • November 03, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • November 03, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 03, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • August 18, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 18, 2016: [Complaint]
  • August 18, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.