U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00376
  • Case Name: Less v. Legacy Brands, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Order]
  • January 29, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 26, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 25, 2018: [Proposed Special Verdict]
  • January 23, 2018: [Order]
  • January 23, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 22, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 22, 2018: [Trial Brief]
  • January 22, 2018: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order]
  • January 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Deposit Funds]
  • January 02, 2018: [Disclosure Statement]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [In Limine]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 08, 2017: [Deposit Funds]
  • December 05, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Supplement]
  • November 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order]
  • November 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Compel]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order]
  • May 04, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Order]
  • March 16, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Order]
  • February 08, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 25, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 19, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 19, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 13, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 13, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Order]
  • September 14, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • August 29, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 26, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 22, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 22, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 22, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • August 22, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 19, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.